MD HB547 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the number of regular members of the Wicomico County Board of Elections, the Worcester County Board of Elections, and the Somerset County Board of Elections; requiring the members of the local boards to be of specified political parties; requiring that a vacancy on the local boards be filled in a specified manner; making a conforming change; and providing for a delayed effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wicomico County, Worcester County, and Somerset County - Boards of Elections -

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-20 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
2010-04-04 Third Reading Passed (47-0)
2010-04-03 Second Reading Passed
2010-04-03 Favorable Report Adopted
2010-04-07 Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2010-03-12 First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2010-04-02 Returned Passed
2010-03-11 Third Reading Passed (137-0)
2010-03-09 Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2010-03-09 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2010-03-08 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2010-02-03 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
2010-02-02 First Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback