MD HB546 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1117
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 443
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 443
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a pedestrian from catching or attempting to catch fish by any means on or under the Maryland Route 18 Kent Island Drawbridge over the Kent Narrows in Queen Anne's County.
Title
Pedestrians - Kent Island Drawbridge - Fishing Prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 443 |
2022-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2022-03-07 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-07 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-02-02 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB1117 (Carry Over) 2021-03-23 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
SB981 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-18 - First Reading Senate Rules
SB981 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-18 - First Reading Senate Rules
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 21 | 507 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |