MD HB544 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a State public body from making an exception for the Housing Authority of the City of Annapolis to a law, rule, regulation, or ordinance that operates in Annapolis and relates to licensure or the inspection of real property, subject to certain exceptions; and applying the Act prospectively.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

City of Annapolis - Housing Authority - Prohibitions Against Exceptions to Local Laws

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-17SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-15SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (131-0)
2020-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {790014/1 Adopted
2020-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-02-20HouseHearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-27HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Same As/Similar To

SB288 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-18 - Returned Passed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Housing and Community Development12201(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development12506(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development13102(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development13103(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development13112(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback