MD HB543 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1582

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-05 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that a person may not be denied the right to purchase, possess, or carry a firearm solely on the basis that the person is authorized to use medical cannabis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms – Right to Purchase, Possess, and Carry – Use of Medical Cannabis

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05HouseHearing 3/10 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-20HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

SB190 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-09 - Motion Special Order until 04/10 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
HB1582 (Carry Over) 2020-02-12 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Safety5701(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback