MD HB542 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 641
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 641
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Investment Committee of the State Retirement Agency to assess the use of minority business enterprises beginning July 1, 2022, and each fiscal year thereafter; requiring a certain certification agency, in consultation with certain entities, to evaluate whether remedial measures are needed to comply with a certain court opinion and any subsequent federal or constitutional requirements; etc.
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Use of Minority and Women-Owned Business Enterprises (Diversity Among Asset Managers Act of 2022)
Sponsors
Del. Jazz Lewis [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 107 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 107 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 641 |
2022-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (107-28) |
2022-03-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-08 | House | Motion Special Order until 3/9 (Delegate Morgan) Adopted |
2022-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {803827/1 Adopted |
2022-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2022-02-02 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m. |
2022-02-02 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-31 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-01-30 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB954 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-08 - Hearing 4/08 at 1:45 p.m.
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Investments
Minorities
Retirement
State Employees
State Government - Pensions and Retirement
Committees and Commissions
Investments
Minorities
Retirement
State Employees
State Government - Pensions and Retirement
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Personnel and Pensions | 21 | 116 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |