MD HB542 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 372
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Task Force to Study Crime Classification and Penalties; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations on certain issues related to the classification of and penalties for criminal and civil violations in the State; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2020; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Task Force to Study Crime Classification and Penalties

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 372
2019-04-08HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-08SenateMotion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
2019-04-08SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-08SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-08SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-04-08SenateRereferred to Judicial Proceedings
2019-04-08SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2019-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (140-0)
2019-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-05HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-05HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2019-02-05HouseHearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback