MD HB541 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB143
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-09 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-09 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adding a representative of a skilled trade organization and a representative of a career college to the list of members who must be selected for the Career and Technical Education Committee; altering the Committee's duties to include the perspective of career colleges and skilled trade organizations; requiring the Committee to develop a list of all skilled trade organization programs and career programs; transferring the Committee from the Governor's Workforce Development Board to an independent unit in the Department of Labor; etc.
Title
Career and Technical Education Committee - Alterations
Sponsors
Del. Lily Qi [D] | Del. Alfred Carr [D] | Del. Terri Hill [D] | Del. Nicole Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-09 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2022-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2022-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {553823/1 Adopted |
2022-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2022-02-02 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m. |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
HB541 (Carry Over) 2022-04-09 - Referred Rules
SB478 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
SB478 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Continuing Education
Counselors
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Higher Education
Job Training
Labor, Department of
Public Schools
Students
Community Colleges
Continuing Education
Counselors
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Higher Education
Job Training
Labor, Department of
Public Schools
Students