MD HB540 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a full-time sworn correctional deputy sheriff in the Office of the Sheriff of Cecil County at the rank of lieutenant and below to take part in or refrain from taking part in forming, joining, supporting, or participating in a labor organization and certain activities relating to the labor organization for the purpose of engaging in collective bargaining with the Sheriff and the County Executive of Cecil County; etc.
Title
Cecil County - Correctional Deputy Sheriffs - Collective Bargaining
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-3) (Y: 132 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-3) (Y: 132 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2019-03-29 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-3) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2019-02-14 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-14 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Cecil County
Collective Bargaining
Correctional Officers
County Executives
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Discipline
Law Enforcement
Petitions
Review Boards
Salaries and Compensation
Sheriffs
Sunset
Unions
Work, Labor and Employment
Collective Bargaining
Correctional Officers
County Executives
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Discipline
Law Enforcement
Petitions
Review Boards
Salaries and Compensation
Sheriffs
Sunset
Unions
Work, Labor and Employment