MD HB54 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-17 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Motor Vehicle Administration to charge a late fee not exceeding $25 for registration renewals that occur more than 1 week after a registration has expired.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws - Registration Renewal - Late Fee

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-17HouseUnfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
2020-01-29HouseHearing canceled
2020-01-09HouseHearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
2020-01-08HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2019-10-15HousePre-filed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Transportation13910(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback