MD HB535 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 721
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Complete Streets Program to provide matching grants to certified jurisdictions to promote healthy communities; providing for program funds to be provided by the Governor in the State budget; specifying the requirements for a local government to be designated as a certified jurisdiction; authorizing a certified jurisdiction to apply for matching grants from the Program; specifying the use of matching grant funds; specifying certain requirements for a certified jurisdiction that receives a grant under the Program; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation - Complete Streets Program - Establishment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (111-28) (Y: 112 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (112-23) (Y: 113 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 721
2018-04-09HousePassed Enrolled
2018-04-09HouseThird Reading Passed (111-28)
2018-04-09HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
2018-04-06SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-06SenateFavorable with Amendments {647371/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-06SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2018-04-03SenateHearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (112-23)
2018-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {280514/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2018-02-22HouseHearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-05HouseHearing canceled
2018-02-15HouseHearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-26HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0535&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0535f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0535t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0535e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_721_hb0535e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0535_28051401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0535_64737101.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0005/hb0535.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0535_env.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0742.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0535_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1292.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1450.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback