MD HB533 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 346
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 346
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the membership of the Board of Regents of the University System of Maryland to include the Secretary of Commerce ex officio, one member each appointed by the President of the Senate and the Speaker of the House, and one additional student member; requiring the Board to make certain meetings available to the public by live and archived video streaming; requiring the Board to review certain annual financial disclosure statements; requiring the Board to provide education and training on its governance policies; etc.
Title
University System of Maryland - Board of Regents - Transparency and Oversight
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 346 |
2019-04-06 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2019-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2019-04-06 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {714432/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-01 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2019-02-26 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-02-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments {634860/1 Report Adopted |
2019-02-25 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2019-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Archives
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Data
Disclosure
Governor
Higher Education
Legislation
Notices
Open Government
Public Information
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
State Documents
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Sunset
Time
Video
Voting
Work, Labor and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Data
Disclosure
Governor
Higher Education
Legislation
Notices
Open Government
Public Information
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
State Documents
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Sunset
Time
Video
Voting
Work, Labor and Employment