MD HB532 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-26 - Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 855
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to authorize the General Assembly to allow a qualified individual to register and vote at a precinct polling place on Election Day; and submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elective Franchise - Registration and Voting at Precinct Polling Place

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (33-14) (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {343324/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (13-34) (Y: 14 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (91-47) (Y: 92 N: 48 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {273726/1 (Delegate McComas) Rejected (50-84) (Y: 51 N: 85 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-26HouseAssigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 855
2018-03-27HouseReturned Passed
2018-03-26SenateThird Reading Passed (33-14)
2018-03-23SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-23SenateFloor Amendment {343324/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (13-34)
2018-03-23SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-22SenateSpecial Order until 3/23 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
2018-03-22SenateFavorable
2018-03-22SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-09SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-08HouseThird Reading Passed (91-47)
2018-03-06HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-06HouseFloor Amendment {883428/1 (Delegate Carr) Adopted
2018-03-06HouseFloor Amendment {273726/1 (Delegate McComas) Rejected (50-84)
2018-03-02HouseSpecial Order until 3/6 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
2018-03-02HouseFavorable with Amendments {585467/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-01HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-02-13HouseHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-26HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0532&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0532f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0532t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_855_hb0532t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0532_58546701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0532_27372601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0532_88342801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0532_34332401.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0002/hb0532.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0532_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0217.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0238.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0532_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0782.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0821.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback