MD HB531 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Enrolled on March 29 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing the termination date for certain provisions of law requiring the Central Payroll Bureau of the Office of the State Comptroller to establish certain pay periods and pay certain employees at certain intervals, requiring appointing authorities to report certain payroll information to the Bureau in a certain manner, requiring the Bureau and the appointing authorities to provide certain information to each employee, establishing a certain grievance procedure, and allowing certain damages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Personnel - Payment of State Employee Wages - Repeal of Sunset Provision

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (33-14) (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (101-38) (Y: 102 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseReturned Passed
2019-03-28SenateThird Reading Passed (33-14)
2019-03-27SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-27SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-25SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-03-11SenateReassigned to Finance
2019-03-08SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-07HouseThird Reading Passed (101-38)
2019-03-05HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-05HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-04HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-02-05HouseHearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback