MD HB530 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-21 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-21 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the University System of Maryland to contract with an independent consultant to study disparities between historically black colleges and universities in the State and the University System of Maryland and their continued relationship; and requiring the University of Maryland to report to the Senate Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee and the House Appropriations Committee on its findings and recommendations by December 1, 2022.
Title
Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Disparities Within and Independence From University System of Maryland - Study
Sponsors
Del. Julian Ivey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-21 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2022-02-02 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m. |
2022-02-02 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading Appropriations |