MD HB529 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Favorable Report by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Reducing to 5 the minimum number of members of the board of directors that a domestic financial guaranty insurance company that is prohibited from issuing new policies must have on its board of directors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance - Formation of Domestic Insurers - Number of Directors

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-03-01SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-02-28HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-02-26HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-02-26HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-25HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2019-02-05HouseHearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback