MD HB527 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the duties of the St. Mary's County Human Relations Commission with regard to encouraging and ensuring the equal treatment of all people; and requiring the Commission to maintain a list on a publicly accessible website of protected classes of people in federal, State, and local laws and regulations related to housing, employment, and public accommodations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

St. Mary’s County Human Relations Commission – Equal Treatment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12SenateUnfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-24SenateHearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-03-22SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-22HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2021-03-20HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-20HouseFavorable with Amendments {306184/1 Adopted
2021-03-20HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2021-01-22HouseHearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-15HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Local Government29101(n/a)See Bill Text
Local Government29106(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback