MD HB527 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-10)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 370
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-10)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 370
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "cottage food product" to include nonhazardous food, as specified in regulations adopted by the Maryland Department of Health, that is sold in the State in accordance with certain laws and regulations to retail food stores or food cooperatives; requiring a certain label for a cottage food product for sale at a retail food store; requiring the owner of a cottage food business to complete a food safety course approved by the Department and submit the label that will be affixed to the product; etc.
Title
Public Health – Cottage Food Products – Definition and Sale
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 370 |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {366980/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Communications
Cooperative Associations
Education
Food
Health
Health, Department of
Industry and Technology
Job Training
Labeling
Postal Service
Public Health
Records
Reports
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Time
Transient Merchants
Communications
Cooperative Associations
Education
Food
Health
Health, Department of
Industry and Technology
Job Training
Labeling
Postal Service
Public Health
Records
Reports
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Time
Transient Merchants