MD HB527 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 375
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 375
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Frederick Regional Higher Education Advisory Board; providing for the composition, appointment, and terms of the Board members; providing for a chair of the Board and the establishment of committees; prohibiting Board members from receiving compensation but entitling Board members to reimbursement for specified expenses; providing for the powers and duties of the Board; authorizing the Board to apply, accept, and expend specified gifts, appropriations, or grants; etc.
Title
Frederick Regional Higher Education Advisory Board
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 375 |
2013-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-11 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2013-03-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-05 | House | Special Order until 3/6 (Delegate Hogan) Adopted |
2013-03-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {454862/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2013-02-19 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-30 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Assessments
Auditors and Audits
Committees and Commissions
Frederick County
Higher Education
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Work, Labor and Employment
Auditors and Audits
Committees and Commissions
Frederick County
Higher Education
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Work, Labor and Employment