MD HB524 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 663
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 663
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing certain employees to sue to recover the difference between certain prevailing wage rates and certain amounts under certain circumstances; providing that a certain determination by the Commissioner of Labor and Industry does not preclude certain employees from filing a certain action; and providing for the liability of certain contractors and subcontractors under certain circumstances.
Title
Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by Employees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-15) (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (97-42) (Y: 98 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (97-42) (Y: 98 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 663 |
2019-03-29 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-15) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-03-08 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2019-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (97-42) |
2019-03-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-04 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Civil Actions
Contractors
Contracts
Crimes and Punishments
Human Rights
Labor and Industry, Division of
Liability
Penalties and Sentences
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Public Employees
Public Works
Reimbursement Rates
Restitution
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Procurement
Work, Labor and Employment
Contractors
Contracts
Crimes and Punishments
Human Rights
Labor and Industry, Division of
Liability
Penalties and Sentences
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Public Employees
Public Works
Reimbursement Rates
Restitution
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Procurement
Work, Labor and Employment