MD HB523 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Budget and Management, in consultation with the Maryland Department of Transportation, to submit to the Senate Budget and Taxation Committee and the House Appropriations Committee by January 1, 2020, a report outlining a certain plan and identifying certain information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Personnel - Employees in the Same Classification - Report

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-5) (Y: 130 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2018-04-06SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-06SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-06SenateSpecial Order until later today (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted
2018-04-06SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2018-04-03SenateHearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (129-5)
2018-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {544967/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-16HouseSpecial Order until later this session (Delegate A. Miller) Adopted
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {544967/1
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2018-02-06HouseHearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-26HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback