MD HB522 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 597
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 597
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Including the actual cost of an auctioneer fee for the tax sale of property in St. Mary's County as an expense of the sale of the property.
Title
St. Mary's County - Tax Sales - Auctioneer Expenses
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 597 |
2022-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-18 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2022-01-27 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 14 | 813 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |