MD HB52 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that certain procedural notice requirements must be fulfilled prior to the filing of a complaint by a landlord or a landlord's duly qualified agent for the repossession of residential rental property for failure to pay rent; requiring that, before a landlord may file a complaint to repossess property for the failure to pay rent, the landlord deliver certain written notice to a tenant; altering from the fifth to the seventh day following the filing of a complaint that at tenant much appear before the court; etc.
Title
Real Property - Eviction Actions - Alterations in Actions for Repossession
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 91 N: 40 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (91-40) |
2021-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-12 | House | Floor Committee Amendment {122510/1 Adopted |
2021-03-11 | House | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted |
2021-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {692910/1 Adopted |
2021-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2021-01-26 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary) |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary and Environment and Transportation |
2020-10-30 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB454 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-25 - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Alternative Dispute Resolution
Appeals
Attorneys
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions and Procedures
Court Costs
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
District Courts
Electronic Communication
Eviction
Evidence
Fees
Housing
Judgments
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Real Property
Residential Property
Restitution
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Sheriffs
State Aid
Summonses
Time
Trials
Warrants
Appeals
Attorneys
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions and Procedures
Court Costs
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
District Courts
Electronic Communication
Eviction
Evidence
Fees
Housing
Judgments
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Real Property
Residential Property
Restitution
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Sheriffs
State Aid
Summonses
Time
Trials
Warrants
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Real Property | 8 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 8 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 8 | 402.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |