MD HB517 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 7 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding the purpose of a certain clean energy loan program to include loans for water efficiency projects, environmental remediation projects intended to remove environmental or health hazards, and resiliency projects to increase the capacity of a property to withstand the effects of climate change; adding water efficiency projects and environmental remediation and resiliency projects to the items requiring eligibility requirements under a certain ordinance; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clean Energy Loan Program - Remediation and Resiliency

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 107 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 114 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07HousePassed Enrolled
2021-04-07SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-04-07SenateConference Committee Report {443927/1 Adopted
2021-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (107-25)
2021-04-06HouseConference Committee Report {443927/1 Adopted
2021-04-02HouseSenate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Hester, Kagan and Ellis)
2021-04-02HouseSenate Refuses Recede
2021-04-02SenateSenate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Hester, Kagan and Ellis)
2021-04-02SenateSenate Refuses Recede
2021-04-02SenateHouse Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Healey, Harrison and Wivell)
2021-04-02SenateHouse Requests Senate Recede
2021-04-02SenateHouse Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
2021-04-01HouseHouse Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Healey, Harrison and Wivell)
2021-04-01HouseHouse Requests Senate Recede
2021-04-01HouseHouse Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
2021-03-31SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-03-30SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-30SenateFavorable with Amendments {614136/1 Adopted
2021-03-30SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-19SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (114-21)
2021-03-17HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-03-17HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2021-01-19HouseHearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-15HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Same As/Similar To

SB319 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-12 - Third Reading Passed (108-28)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Local Government11101(n/a)See Bill Text
Local Government11102(n/a)See Bill Text
Local Government11103(n/a)See Bill Text
Local Government11104(n/a)See Bill Text
Local Government11105(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0517?ys=2021RS
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0517f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0517t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0517e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0007/hb0517_61413601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0007/hb0517_44392701.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/hb0517_ent.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/hb0517_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0583.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0775.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/1104.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0966.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback