MD HB517 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 772
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Altering a certain provision of law to exempt a prescriber from being required to request certain data from the Prescription Drug Monitoring Program if the opioid or benzodiazepine is prescribed or dispensed to an individual to treat or prevent acute pain for not more than 14 days following any surgical procedure, rather than only surgical procedures in which general anesthesia was used; and making the Act subject to a certain contingency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prescription Drug Monitoring Program – Data Request Exemption – Surgical Procedures

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 772
2018-04-03HousePassed Enrolled
2018-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-04-03HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-03-29SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
2018-03-28SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-28SenateFavorable with Amendments {987472/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-28SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2018-03-27SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-09SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-03-08HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-03-07HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-07HouseFavorable with Amendments {296184/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-06HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-02-13HouseHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-26HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0517&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0517f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0517t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0517e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0007/hb0517_29618401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0007/hb0517_98747201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0007/hb0517.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0517_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0296.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0517_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0931.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1009.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback