MD HB517 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a cemetery to provide for interest or a finance charge in a preneed burial contract; and repealing a provision that limits to specified goods and services the authority of a cemetery to impose interest or a finance charge in a preneed burial contract.
Title
Cemeteries - Preneed Burial Contracts - Interest or Finance Charges
Sponsors
Del. Wade Kach [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn | |
2011-02-24 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-02-16 | Hearing 3/2 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2011rs/billfile/HB0517.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2011rs/bills/hb/hb0517f.pdf |