MD HB516 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 73
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Office of Legislative Audits to conduct an audit of the Baltimore Police Department to evaluate the effectiveness and efficiency of the financial management practices of the Department beginning July 1, 2020, and at least once every 6 years thereafter; and requiring the Office of Legislative Audits to provide information regarding the audit process to the Baltimore Police Department.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Office of Legislative Audits - Audits of the Baltimore Police Department

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 73
2019-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {414167/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2019-02-05HouseHearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback