MD HB516 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that individuals employed as hazardous material response team employees for local government agencies are eligible for death benefits and funeral expenses under specified circumstances; and providing that the benefit may only be paid if a local government agency that employs a hazardous material response team employee maintains in reserve the amount needed to pay for one death benefit and one funeral benefit for a hazardous material response team employee.
Title
Hazardous Material Response Team Employees - Death Benefits and Funeral
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-04-01 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-05 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2010-03-30 | Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-17 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | |
2010-03-31 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-16 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2010-03-11 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-11 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-10 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Counties
Death
Emergencies
Funerals
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Municipal Corporations
Public Employees
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Work, Labor and Employment
Counties
Death
Emergencies
Funerals
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Municipal Corporations
Public Employees
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Work, Labor and Employment