MD HB515 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 369
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a municipality to designate a qualified building inspector or enforcement officer to testify in a municipal infraction proceeding without the assistance of a prosecuting attorney; providing that a prosecuting attorney is not limited in or restricted from calling individuals to testify in a municipal infraction proceeding; and defining "qualified building inspector or enforcement officer" as persons nationally accredited and certified by the International Code Council or the National Fire Protection Association.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Municipalities - Municipal Infraction Proceedings - Designation of a Building Inspector or an Enforcement Officer to Testify

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 369
2019-04-08HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-05SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18SenateHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-14SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2019-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {990919/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-02-07HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback