MD HB512 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 230
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 230
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing certain controlled dangerous substance prescriptions to be dispensed on an electronic prescription; requiring, except under certain circumstances, a certain health practitioner to issue a prescription for a controlled dangerous substance electronically; authorizing an authorized prescriber to issue a written or oral prescription for a controlled dangerous substance only under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Controlled Dangerous Substances
Sponsors
Del. Erek Barron [D] | Del. Heather Bagnall [D] | Del. Jason Buckel [R] | Del. Nicholaus Kipke [R] |
Del. Robbyn Lewis [D] | Del. Kathy Szeliga [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Readings Passed with Amendments (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Readings Passed with Amendments (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 230 |
2020-03-17 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-17 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Readings Passed with Amendments (45-0) |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Floor Amendment {543127/1 (Senator Kelley) Adopted |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-03-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2020-03-04 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments {736281/1 Adopted |
2020-03-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-01-28 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-27 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Assisted Living
Committees and Commissions
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Crimes and Punishments
Discipline
Drugs
Electronic Communication
Health Care Commission
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Hospices
Medical Research
Medical Treatments
Nursing Homes
Penalties and Sentences
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Public Health
Rules and Regulations
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Veterinarians
Committees and Commissions
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Crimes and Punishments
Discipline
Drugs
Electronic Communication
Health Care Commission
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Hospices
Medical Research
Medical Treatments
Nursing Homes
Penalties and Sentences
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Public Health
Rules and Regulations
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Veterinarians
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 5 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 5 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 5 | 504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 5 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Correctional Services | 1 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 21 | 220 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |