MD HB512 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Interagency Commission on School Construction to include in regulations for new construction or major renovations approved on or after July 1, 2019, a requirement that the State-funded maximum gross area allowance for certain English learners be equal to the State-funded maximum gross area allowance for special education students.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public School Construction - Maximum Gross Area Allowance for English Learner Students

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseUnfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
2019-02-05HouseHearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback