MD HB512 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting employers that employ 15 or more employees from seeking wage history information orally, in writing, or through an employee or an agent for an employee; prohibiting employers that employ 15 or more employees from screening an applicant for employment based on the applicant's wage history by taking certain actions; requiring the Commissioner of Labor and Industry to issue a certain order under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Labor and Employment - Wage History Information

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (88-47) (Y: 89 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29SenateHearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (88-47)
2018-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {563194/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2018-02-13HouseHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-26HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback