MD HB507 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a law enforcement agency that issues electronic control devices (ECDs) to its law enforcement officers to report annually on or before March 31 to the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention, information for each time a law enforcement officer discharges an ECD except during training, using a specified format; requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to analyze and summarize reports and to submit an annual report to the Governor, the General Assembly, and each law enforcement agency; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Use of Electronic Control Devices - Reports
Sponsors
Del. Curtis Anderson [D] | Del. Sam Arora [D] | Del. Ben Barnes [D] | Del. Talmadge Branch [D] |
Del. Kathleen Dumais [D] | Del. James Gilchrist [D] | Del. Ana Gutierrez [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 89 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 39 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 39 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-01 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (39-7) | |
2011-03-31 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-31 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-03-18 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-04-02 | Passed Enrolled | |
2011-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (89-47) | |
2011-04-02 | House Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2011-03-17 | Third Reading Passed (94-46) | |
2011-03-15 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-15 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-14 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 3/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Law Enforcement
Police Training Commission
Public Information
Reports
Sunset
Weapons
Law Enforcement
Police Training Commission
Public Information
Reports
Sunset
Weapons