MD HB504 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring that, on and after July 1, 2020, certain standards for purchase of vehicles by the Department of General Services include the social cost of certain carbon emissions as part of a life-cycle cost; requiring the Department of Budget and Management to adopt certain regulations on or before January 1, 2020; requiring the Department of General Services to calculate the social cost of carbon emissions during the preliminary design phase of the construction or renovation of any building; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Purchase of Motor Vehicles and Building Construction, Renovation, Rehabilitation, and Modification - Social Cost of Carbon Emissions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseHearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback