MD HB504 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 809
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 809
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a specified marketer from knowingly selling or providing electric switches, electric relays, and gas valve switches that contain mercury to a consumer on or after October 1, 2018; establishing specified penalties for specified violations; and authorizing the Department of the Environment to impose specified penalties in a specified manner for specified violations.
Title
Products That Contain Mercury - Prohibition on Sale of Electric Switches, Electric Relays, and Gas Valve Switches
Sponsors
Del. Shane Robinson [D] | Del. Alfred Carr [D] | Del. David Fraser-hidalgo [D] | Del. Stephen Lafferty [D] |
Sen. Clarence Lam [D] | Del. Robbyn Lewis [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-15) (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (128-12) (Y: 128 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (128-12) (Y: 128 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-27 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 809 |
2017-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-15) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Floor Amendment {883922/1 (Senator Salling) Withdrawn |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment {224933/1 Withdrawn |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Floor Amendment {883922/1 (Senator Salling) Adopted |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Special Order until 4/7 (Senator Young) Adopted |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Floor Amendment {883922/1 (Senator Salling) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {224933/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-12) |
2017-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {780813/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-27 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Environment
Environment, Department of
Equipment
Fines
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Penalties and Sentences
Retail Sales
Utilities
Environment
Environment, Department of
Equipment
Fines
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Penalties and Sentences
Retail Sales
Utilities