MD HB503 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Translation Grant Program in the State Department of Education to provide grants to county boards that are experiencing a significant number of requests to translate educational materials into a student's or parent's native language; requiring the Program to be a competitive grant program; requiring the Department to establish application procedures and supervise the use of certain funds; requiring the Governor to include at least $125,000 annually for the program beginning in fiscal year 2020; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Department of Education - Translation Grant Program - Established

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (95-41) (Y: 96 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-02SenateUnfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-28SenateHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (95-41)
2018-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {865569/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-02-15HouseHearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-26HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback