MD HB502 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Office of Recycling within the Department of the Environment to provide to local communities certain encouragement, information, and examples relating to certain programs that divert mattresses and box springs from disposal in landfills and incinerators and that recycle or reuse mattresses and box springs; and requiring the Office, in coordination with the Maryland Environmental Service, to include in a certain report certain information relating to mattresses and box springs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environment - Office of Recycling - Mattresses and Box Springs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19SenateHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-15HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-02-07HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback