MD HB502 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 309
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the eligibility for a credit authorized against the county or municipal corporation property tax for certain veterans to include certain surviving spouses of certain veterans; and providing that the Act shall be applicable to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property Tax Credit - Surviving Spouse of Veteran

Sponsors

Del. Jheanelle Wilkins [D]Del. Bilal Ali [D]Del. Anne Kaiser [D]Del. Frank Turner [D]
Del. Christopher Adams [R]Del. Kathy Afzali [R]Del. Curtis Anderson [D]Del. Susan Aumann [R]
Del. Charles Barkley [D]Del. Darryl Barnes [D]Del. Pamela Beidle [D]Del. Wendell Beitzel [R]
Del. Eric Bromwell [D]Del. Benjamin Brooks [D]Del. Jason Buckel [R]Del. Mary Carozza [R]
Del. Alfred Carr [D]Del. Andrew Cassilly [R]Del. Barrie Ciliberti [R]Del. John Cluster [R]
Del. Kathleen Dumais [D]Del. Eric Ebersole [D]Del. Diana Fennell [D]Del. Bob Flanagan [R]
Del. William Folden [R]Del. Barbara Frush [D]Del. Tawanna Gaines [D]Del. Glen Glass [R]
Del. Ana Gutierrez [D]Del. Anne Healey [D]Del. Sheila Hixson [D]Del. Marvin Holmes [D]
Del. Kevin Hornberger [R]Del. Carolyn Howard [D]Del. Seth Howard [R]Del. Richard Impallaria [R]
Del. Michael Jackson [D]Del. Sally Jameson [D]Del. Nicholaus Kipke [R]Del. Trent Kittleman [R]
Del. Tony Knotts [D]Del. Susan Krebs [R]Del. Mary Ann Lisanti [D]Del. Bob Long [R]
Del. Eric Luedtke [D]Del. Michael Malone [R]Del. Johnny Mautz [R]Del. Susan McComas [R]
Del. Patrick McDonough [R]Del. Herbert McMillan [R]Del. Ric Metzgar [R]Del. Aruna Miller [D]
Del. Warren Miller [R]Del. Charles Otto [R]Del. Edith Patterson [D]Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D]
Del. Andrew Platt [D]Del. Elizabeth Proctor [D]Del. Pamela Queen [D]Del. Teresa Reilly [R]
Del. Deb Rey [R]Del. April Rose [R]Del. Sid Saab [R]Del. Sheree Sample-Hughes [D]
Del. Haven Shoemaker [R]Del. Theodore Sophocleus [D]Del. Kathy Szeliga [R]Del. James Tarlau [D]
Del. Jay Walker [D]Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D]Del. David Vogt [R]Del. Jeff Waldstreicher [D]
Del. Alonzo Washington [D]Del. Mary Washington [D]Del. C.T. Wilson [D]Del. Pat Young [D]

Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 309
2018-03-27HouseReturned Passed
2018-03-26SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2018-03-23SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-23SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-23SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2018-03-20SenateHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-02SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2018-03-01HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2018-02-27HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-02-27HouseFloor Amendment {963929/1 (Delegate Wilson) Adopted
2018-02-27HouseFloor Amendment {663722/1 (Delegate A. Miller) Adopted
2018-02-23HouseSpecial Order until 2/27 (Delegate Walker) Adopted
2018-02-23HouseFloor Amendment {723022/1 (Delegate Metzgar) Adopted
2018-02-23HouseFavorable with Amendments {105461/1 Report Adopted
2018-02-22HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-02-06HouseHearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-26HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0502&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0502f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0502t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_309_hb0502t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0502_10546101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0502_72302201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0502_66372201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0502_96392901.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0002/hb0502.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0502_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0191.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0502_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0820.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback