MD HB502 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-12 - Re-referred Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing, in specified counties, the Department of Natural Resources to allow a person to hunt deer on private property on specified Sundays; stating the intent of the General Assembly that the Department evaluate specified deer hunting opportunities on specified public lands for specified purposes; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Calvert, Charles, and St. Mary's Counties - Deer Hunting

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-12 Re-referred Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2010-04-06 First Reading Senate Rules
2010-04-04 Third Reading Passed (124-11)
2010-04-03 Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2010-04-03 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2010-04-10 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
2010-02-03 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2010-02-01 First Reading Environmental Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback