MD HB501 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Workers' Compensation Commission, if there is no compensation other than a medical benefit payable to a covered employee, to order that a fee of not more than $2,000 for legal services rendered on behalf of the covered employee be payable by the covered employee, an employer or its insurer, a self-insured employer, or the Uninsured Employers' Fund; exempting the ordered fee from the requirement that a fee approved by the Commission be a lien on compensation awarded; and applying the Act prospectively.
Title
Labor and Employment - Workers' Compensation Claims - Fees for Legal Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2022-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB433 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-11 - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Health Insurance
Insurance
Salaries and Compensation
Work, Labor, and Employment
Workers' Compensation
Health Insurance
Insurance
Salaries and Compensation
Work, Labor, and Employment
Workers' Compensation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Labor and Employment | 9 | 731 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |