MD HB498 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Board of Public Works, for meetings held on or after October 1, 2024, to allow members of the public to submit certain public comments electronically except under certain circumstances; requiring public comments to be included in certain meeting materials and posted and retained online; and requiring an additional staff position at the Board to carry out requirements of the Act.
Title
Board of Public Works Public Comment Act
Sponsors
Del. Marc Korman [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-24 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147 |
2023-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2023-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2023-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {543021/1 Adopted |
2023-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2023-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-30 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB328 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 148
Subjects
Electronic Communication
internet
meetings
Open Government
Public Information
Public Works
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
internet
meetings
Open Government
Public Information
Public Works
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 10 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |