MD HB497 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the types of health care providers required to complete a physical examination of a student entering the Maryland Public School System for the first time to include a licensed physician assistant with a delegation agreement approved by the State Board of Physicians.
Title
Education - School Physical Examinations - Physician Assistant
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2020-03-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {265967/1 Adopted |
2020-03-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2020-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-24 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB726 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 578
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Examinations
Health
Licenses
Physician Assistants
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Examinations
Health
Licenses
Physician Assistants
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools