MD HB497 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Hearing 3/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the time frame of certain notices that a mobile home park owner is required to provide to each resident in the mobile home park and the Department of Housing and Community Development, and to post in a public area of the mobile home park, concerning the sale of the mobile home park, to be not less than 30 days before the date of the sale of the park.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Real Property - Sales of Mobile Home Parks - Notice Requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12SenateHearing 3/20 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-03-01SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-28HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-02-26HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-26HouseFavorable with Amendments {820211/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-25HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-02-05HouseHearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-01HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback