MD HB492 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB66

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-17 - Referred Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a train or light engine used in the movement of freight in the same rail corridor as a high-speed passenger or commuter train from being operated in the State unless it has at least two crew members; establishing certain penalties; providing that a railroad company is solely responsible for certain actions of its agents or employees; prohibiting a county or municipal corporation from enacting and enforcing more stringent measures; requiring certain notice be made to the Department of Legislative Services; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-17SenateReferred Finance
2021-02-16HouseThird Reading Passed (97-32)
2021-02-11HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-02-10HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2021-01-19HouseHearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-15HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Same As/Similar To

HB66 (Carry Over) 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor and Employment5110(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback