MD HB492 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 473
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 473
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adding the Somerset County Economic Development Commission as an eligible governmental unit in the Employees' Pension System; providing that specified individuals are subject to the alternate contributory pension benefit in the Employees' Pension System in the same manner as specified other individuals; etc.
Title
Employees' Pension System - Somerset County Economic Development Commission - Eligible Governmental Unit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 473 |
2013-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 8:30 a.m. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2013-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2013-03-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {434968/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2013-02-19 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-30 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Local Government - Generally
Public Employees
Retirement Systems
Somerset County
State Pensions and Retirement
Committees and Commissions
Local Government - Generally
Public Employees
Retirement Systems
Somerset County
State Pensions and Retirement