MD HB490 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing certain retirees, spouses, and dependent children to elect coverage under the State prescription drug benefit plan; altering to January 1, 2020, the date by which the State is required to discontinue coverage under the State prescription drug benefit plan for certain Medicare-eligible retirees, spouses, and dependent children; exempting certain retirees, spouses, and dependent children from the requirement for the State to terminate coverage under the State prescription drug benefit plan for certain individuals; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Prescription Drug Benefit Plan - Termination of Coverage for Retirees - Exemptions and Alterations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-14HouseHearing canceled
2019-02-11HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-01HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback