MD HB490 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the State Community Health Worker Advisory Committee to advise the Maryland Department of Health on certain matters relating to the certification and training of community health workers; requiring the Department to adopt certain regulations for accrediting certified community health worker training programs; providing that, subject to a certain exception, a certified community health worker training program must be approved by the Department before operating in the State; etc.
Title
Public Health - Community Health Workers - Advisory Committee and Certification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2018-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {756380/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-02-14 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-25 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Appeals
Apprentices
Associations
Committees and Commissions
Continuing Education
Criminal Background Investigations
Dietitians and Nutritionists
Fees
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Hospitals
Job Training
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Language
Liability
Licenses
Notices
Nurses
Penalties and Sentences
Public Health
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Social Services
Social Workers
Apprentices
Associations
Committees and Commissions
Continuing Education
Criminal Background Investigations
Dietitians and Nutritionists
Fees
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Hospitals
Job Training
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Language
Liability
Licenses
Notices
Nurses
Penalties and Sentences
Public Health
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Social Services
Social Workers