MD HB49 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Clarifying that the amounts on which a certain assessment is calculated for the purpose of recouping a certain health insurance provider fee are for insurance products that are subject to a certain provision of federal law and may be subject to an assessment by the State; requiring that the calculation of the assessment be made without regard to threshold limits established in a certain provision of the Affordable Care Act or the partial exclusion of net premiums provided for in a certain provision of the Affordable Care Act; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recoupment of the Health Insurance Provider Fee - Calculation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (125-13) (Y: 126 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12SenateHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-01SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-02-28HouseThird Reading Passed (125-13)
2019-02-26HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-02-26HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-25HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-02-01HouseHearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-14HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback