MD HB487 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-29 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-29 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to increase the number of years between successive retention elections for judges of the Court of Appeals and Court of Special Appeals from 10 years to 12 years; proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to provide for a retention election for a Judge of the Circuit Court; submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection; etc.
Title
Judicial Elections - Retention and Frequency
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn |
2019-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary) and Hearing canceled (Ways and Means) |
2019-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 11:30 a.m. (Judiciary) and Hearing canceled (Ways and Means) |
2019-02-20 | House | Hearing canceled (Judiciary) and Hearing canceled (Ways and Means) |
2019-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary) and Hearing canceled (Ways and Means) |
2019-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary) and Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) |
2019-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary) |
2019-02-01 | House | First Reading Judiciary and Ways and Means |
Subjects
Circuit Courts
Constitutional Amendments
Court of Appeals
Court of Special Appeals
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Elections
Judges
Mandatory Retirement
Referendum
Constitutional Amendments
Court of Appeals
Court of Special Appeals
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Elections
Judges
Mandatory Retirement
Referendum