MD HB483 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an agency or the Office of Administrative Hearings to dispose of a contested case within 90 days from a certain evidentiary hearing; authorizing a certain named party to provide certain written notice that a decision is due; establishing that a certain decision shall be deemed in favor of the named party under certain circumstances; and requiring a certain unit to issue a certain order on a certain summary suspension within 30 days from the date of the summary suspension.
Title
Administrative Procedure Act - Dispositions and Summary Suspensions - Time Periods
Sponsors
Del. Susan Krebs [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary |
2020-01-28 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-24 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB297 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-23 - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Appeals
Communications
Evidence
Hearings
Licenses
Names
Notices
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Time
Appeals
Communications
Evidence
Hearings
Licenses
Names
Notices
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 10 | 210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 10 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |