MD HB481 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 85-36)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Hearing 3/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Reclassifying, as a felony instead of a misdemeanor, the crime of selling, bartering, trading, or offering to sell, barter, or trade a minor for money, property, or anything else of value.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Law - Sale of a Minor - Felony

Sponsors

Del. Nick Mosby [D]Del. Haven Shoemaker [R]Del. Gabriel Acevero [D]Del. Christopher Adams [R]
Del. Carl Anderton [R]Del. Steven Arentz [R]Del. Lauren Arikan [R]Del. Dalya Attar [D]
Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D]Del. Heather Bagnall [D]Del. Ben Barnes [D]Del. Darryl Barnes [D]
Del. Erek Barron [D]Del. Sandy Bartlett [D]Del. Kumar Barve [D]Del. Wendell Beitzel [R]
Del. Joseph Boteler [R]Del. Regina Boyce [D]Del. Talmadge Branch [D]Del. Tony Bridges [D]
Del. Eric Bromwell [D]Del. Benjamin Brooks [D]Del. Jason Buckel [R]Del. Alice Cain [D]
Del. Jon Cardin [D]Del. Alfred Carr [D]Del. Andrew Cassilly [R]Del. Lorig Charkoudian [D]
Del. Nick Charles [D]Del. Jerry Clark [R]Del. Frank Conaway [D]Del. Paul Corderman [R]
Del. Dan Cox [R]Del. Brian Crosby [D]Del. Charlotte Crutchfield [D]Del. Bonnie Cullison [D]
Del. Dereck Davis [D]Del. Eric Ebersole [D]Del. Jessica Feldmark [D]Del. Diana Fennell [D]
Del. Mark Fisher [R]Del. Wanika Fisher [D]Del. David Fraser-hidalgo [D]Del. James Gilchrist [D]
Del. Cheryl Glenn [D]Del. Michele Guyton [D]Del. Wayne Hartman [R]Del. Keith Haynes [D]
Del. Shelly Hettleman [D]Del. Terri Hill [D]Del. Marvin Holmes [D]Del. Kevin Hornberger [R]
Del. Richard Impallaria [R]Del. Julian Ivey [D]Del. Michael Jackson [D]Del. Jay Jacobs [R]
Del. Jay Jalisi [D]Del. Steve Johnson [D]Del. Adrienne Jones [D]Del. Anne Kaiser [D]
Del. Ariana Kelly [D]Del. Ken Kerr [D]Del. Nicholaus Kipke [R]Del. Trent Kittleman [R]
Del. Marc Korman [D]Del. Susan Krebs [R]Del. Carol Krimm [D]Del. Stephen Lafferty [D]
Del. Mary Lehman [D]Del. Jazz Lewis [D]Del. Robbyn Lewis [D]Del. Brooke Lierman [D]
Del. Mary Ann Lisanti [D]Del. Bob Long [R]Del. Lesley Lopez [D]Del. Sara Love [D]
Del. Eric Luedtke [D]Del. Nino Mangione [R]Del. Johnny Mautz [R]Del. Susan McComas [R]
Del. Maggie McIntosh [D]Del. Mike Mckay [R]Del. Ric Metzgar [R]Del. Warren Miller [R]
Del. David Moon [D]Del. Matt Morgan [R]Del. Charles Otto [R]Del. Julie Palakovich Carr [D]
Del. Neil Parrott [R]Del. Edith Patterson [D]Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D]Del. Shane Pendergrass [D]
Del. Jesse Pippy [R]Del. Elizabeth Proctor [D]Del. Lily Qi [D]Del. Pamela Queen [D]
Del. Teresa Reilly [R]Del. April Rose [R]Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D]Del. Sid Saab [R]
Del. Sheree Sample-Hughes [D]Del. Emily Shetty [D]Del. Stephanie Smith [D]Del. Jared Solomon [D]
Del. Vaughn Stewart [D]Del. Charles Sydnor [D]Del. Kathy Szeliga [R]Del. Jen Terrasa [D]
Del. Veronica Turner [D]Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D]Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D]Del. Jay Walker [D]
Del. Alonzo Washington [D]Del. Courtney Watson [D]Del. Ron Watson [D]Del. Melissa Wells [D]
Del. Jheanelle Wilkins [D]Del. C.T. Wilson [D]Del. William Wivell [R]Del. Karen Young [D]
Del. Pat Young [D]

Roll Calls

2019-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12SenateHearing 3/19 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-03-11SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-08HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2019-03-07HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-07HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-06HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2019-02-01HouseHearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-01HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback